AZ HB2116 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Chapter 290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Chapter 290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Municipal zoning; rezoning protests
Title
Municipal zoning; rezoning protests
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Chapter 290 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-08 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2017-05-08 | House | House concurs |
2017-04-04 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2017-04-04 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2017-03-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-02 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-5-1-0) |
2017-01-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-01-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-01-30 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-01-30 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-24 | House | House FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2017-01-17 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned to House FPRPP Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |