AZ HB2286 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Driver license violations; suspensions
Title
Driver license violations; suspensions
Sponsors
Rep. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Governor Signed | |
2012-04-10 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-10 | House final reading , voting: (39-20-1-0) | |
2012-04-10 | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-04-05 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-05 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-04 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-04 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-12 | Senate NRT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Senate NRT Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate NRT Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | House third reading PASSED voting: (44-16-0-0) | |
2012-03-05 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-27 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-16 | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-1-0-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House TRANS Committee | |
2012-01-18 | House read second time | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House TRANS Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced in House and read first time |