AZ HB2297 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Performance and restoration account
Title
Performance and restoration account
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Governor Signed | |
2013-06-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate NRRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate NRRA Committee |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRRA Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-02-18 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2013-02-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | House EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House EENR Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |