AZ HB2312 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Structural pest management; regulation.
Title
Structural pest management; regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | House final reading , voting: (53-6-1-0) | |
2011-04-19 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-13 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-13 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-05 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-05 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-04 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Senate NRT Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-16 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Assigned to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-09 | House third reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-07 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-03-02 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-02 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-17 | House AW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to House AW Committee | |
2011-01-24 | House read second time | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House AW Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced in House and read first time |