AZ HB2341 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Residential contractors' recovery fund
Title
Residential contractors' recovery fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | House final reading , voting: (49-10-1-0) | |
2011-04-19 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-19 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-1-1-0) | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2011-04-05 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-05 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-04 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-29 | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (11-2-0-0) | |
2011-03-28 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-03-28 | Senate CE Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-28 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-01 | House third reading , voting: (38-19-3-0) | |
2011-02-24 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-22 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-1-0-0) | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2011-01-25 | House read second time | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced in House and read first time |