AZ HB2343 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Chapter 207
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Chapter 207
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Wildfire prevention; state trust land
Title
Wildfire prevention; state trust land
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Chapter 207 | |
2014-04-23 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-22 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-21 | House | House final reading , voting: (55-0-5-0) |
2014-04-21 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-0-7-1) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate NRRA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-0-4-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate NRRA Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRRA Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-3-3-0) |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-1-0) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2014-02-10 | House | House EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to House EENR Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |