AZ HB2360 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Game and fish appointment board
Title
Game and fish appointment board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Energy and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Energy and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-13 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-13 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Consent Calendar March 07, 2011 @ 1:25 PM with Objections | |
2011-03-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-07 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Senate NRT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-02-14 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-02-14 | House third reading , voting: (49-11-0-0) | |
2011-02-10 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-02-07 | House Consent Calendar February 07, 2011 @ 2:06 PM with Objections | |
2011-02-08 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-08 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-07 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-31 | House ENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to House ENR Committee | |
2011-01-24 | House read second time | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House ENR Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced in House and read first time |