AZ HB2372 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle dealers
Title
Motor vehicle dealers
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | Governor Signed | |
2013-04-08 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-04-08 | House | House final reading , voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2013-04-08 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2013-04-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-0-5-0) |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate TRANS Committee |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANS Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-02-27 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2013-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-07 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House TRANS Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |