AZ HB2372 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-2-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-2-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Graham rehabilitation center; uses; nonlapsing
Title
Graham rehabilitation center; uses; nonlapsing
Sponsors
Rep. Lupe Diaz [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-2-0) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-0-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-24 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-7-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Department Of Economic Security (des)
Des (see Also: Department Of Economic Security)
Graham Rehabilitation Center
Nonlapsing
Supplemental Appropriation
Uses
Department Of Economic Security (des)
Des (see Also: Department Of Economic Security)
Graham Rehabilitation Center
Nonlapsing
Supplemental Appropriation
Uses