AZ HB2373 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tax corrections act of 2019
Title
Tax corrections act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Toma [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Chapter 203 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-02 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-2-0) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Department Of Insurance
State Government - Title 41
Tax Corrections
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Tobacco Products
State Government - Title 41
Tax Corrections
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Tobacco Products
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 1520 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1124 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1126 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1129 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 2075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 3401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1083.04 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1164.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |