AZ HB2379 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Election procedures manual; statutory conflict
Title
Election procedures manual; statutory conflict
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-02-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Conduct Of Elections
Election Procedures
Election Procedures Manual (s)
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Electronic Voting System (s)
Manual
Statutory Conflict
Election Procedures
Election Procedures Manual (s)
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Electronic Voting System (s)
Manual
Statutory Conflict