AZ HB2387 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - Referred to Senate APPROP Committee
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - Referred to Senate APPROP Committee
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Recovery of attorney fees
Title
Recovery of attorney fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-2-0) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-02-28 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-23-3-0) |
2013-02-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2013-02-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2013-01-24 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |