AZ HB2403 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Trusts and estates
Title
Trusts and estates
Sponsors
Rep. David Smith [R] | Rep. Ted Vogt [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | House final reading , voting: (60-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-19 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2011-04-18 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Consent Calendar March 28, 2011 @ 1:35 PM with Objections | |
2011-03-29 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-15 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-15 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-03-15 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-10 | House third reading , voting: (60-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-09 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-17 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2011-01-27 | House read second time | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Introduced in House and read first time |