AZ HB2421 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
School districts; budgets; financial reports
Title
School districts; budgets; financial reports
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. Jeff Dial [R] | Rep. Tom Forese [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Rep. Jack Harper [R] | Rep. Peggy Judd [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] |
Rep. David Stevens [R] | Rep. Steve Urie [R] | Rep. Ted Vogt [R] | Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-13 | House final reading , voting: (57-0-3-0) | |
2011-04-13 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-08 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-07 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-29 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2011-02-22 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-21 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-02-17 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-02-17 | House third reading , voting: (56-4-0-0) | |
2011-02-10 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-08 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-08 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-07 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-31 | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-2-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to House ED Committee | |
2011-01-25 | House read second time | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to House ED Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced in House and read first time |