AZ HB2423 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State institutions; technical correction
Title
State institutions; technical correction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-11 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-08 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-07 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Consent Calendar March 21, 2011 @ 12:46 PM | |
2011-03-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-21 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-03 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-03 | House third reading , voting: (44-13-3-0) | |
2011-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-22 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | House ERA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-3-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to House ERA Committee | |
2011-02-09 | House read second time | |
2011-02-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Assigned to House ERA Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced in House and read first time |