AZ HB2424 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Defensive driving schools
Title
Defensive driving schools
Sponsors
Sen. Manuel Alvarez [D] | Rep. Tom Chabin [D] | Sen. Rich Crandall [R] | Rep. Sam Crump [R] |
Sen. David Gowan [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] | Rep. Warde Nichols [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-28 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-04-05 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-06 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-04-06 | Senate read second time | |
2010-04-05 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-05 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-04-05 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-04-01 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-01 | House third reading , voting: (33-21-6-0) | |
2010-03-30 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2010-03-23 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-23 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-15 | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2010-02-25 | House TI Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-2-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to House TI Committee | |
2010-01-21 | House read second time | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House TI Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced in House and read first time |