AZ HB2442 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Community college expenditure limits; recalculation
Title
Community college expenditure limits; recalculation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2015-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-1-0-0) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2015-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |