AZ HB2479 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - House GOV Committee action: Discussed and Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - House GOV Committee action: Discussed and Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eminent domain; improvements; assessing value
Title
Eminent domain; improvements; assessing value
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Seel [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-02 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House GOV Committee action: Discussed and Held | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2012-02-02 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2012-01-19 | House read second time | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |