AZ HB2523 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle accidents; violations
Title
Motor vehicle accidents; violations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | House final reading , voting: (37-21-2-0) | |
2011-04-20 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-20 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-20 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-20 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-20 | Senate third reading , voting: (25-5-0-0) | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-29 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Senate PSHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-10 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-10 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-02 | House third reading , voting: (25-32-3-0) | |
2011-02-21 | House Consent Calendar February 21, 2011 @ 4:21 PM | |
2011-02-22 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-10 | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-01-24 | House read second time | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced in House and read first time |