AZ HB2548 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Medical helicopters; nontrauma patients; guidelines
Title
Medical helicopters; nontrauma patients; guidelines
Sponsors
Sen. Paula Aboud [D] | Rep. Cecil Ash [R] | Rep. Matthew Heinz [D] | Sen. John McComish [R] |
Rep. Eric Meyer [D] | Rep. Ted Vogt [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-13 | House final reading , voting: (54-3-3-0) | |
2011-04-13 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-07 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-07 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-06 | Senate third reading , voting: (22-7-1-0) | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-29 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Senate HMLR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-17 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | House third reading , voting: (57-2-1-0) | |
2011-03-16 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-03-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-14 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-02 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2011-01-27 | House read second time | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Introduced in House and read first time |