AZ HB2561 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Agency accounts; technical correction
Title
Agency accounts; technical correction
Sponsors
Rep. Lucy Mason [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-08 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-01 | House WE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-1-0-1-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Referred to House WE Committee | |
2010-04-01 | House read second time | |
2010-03-31 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Assigned to House WE Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Introduced in House and read first time |