AZ HB2561 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-31 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-31 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
City water provider; requirements; service
Title
City water provider; requirements; service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House - Motion For purposes of consideration of House Bill 2561 today, I move the House suspend Rule 32 and notwithstanding any other House Rule, House Bill 2561 be placed on an active Additional calendar of Committee of the Whole for today. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - Motion Representative Biasiucci made a motion to extend the reconsideration period for HB2561 for an additional 14 days. Passsed by v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Motion Representative Kolodin made a motion to extend the reconsideration period for HB2561 for an additional 14 days. Passsed by v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Motion Representative Kolodin made a motion to extend the reconsideration period for HB2561 for an additional 14 days. Passsed by s/v 31-29 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House - Motion Representative Biasiucci motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), House Bill 2561 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House - Motion For purposes of consideration of House Bill 2561 today, I move the House suspend Rule 32 and notwithstanding any other House Rule, House Bill 2561 be placed on an active Additional calendar of Committee of the Whole for today. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - Motion Representative Biasiucci made a motion to extend the reconsideration period for HB2561 for an additional 14 days. Passsed by v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Motion Representative Kolodin made a motion to extend the reconsideration period for HB2561 for an additional 14 days. Passsed by v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Motion Representative Kolodin made a motion to extend the reconsideration period for HB2561 for an additional 14 days. Passsed by s/v 31-29 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House - Motion Representative Biasiucci motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), House Bill 2561 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-07-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-05-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-13-0-0) |
2023-04-13 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-04-13 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-13 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Representative Biasiucci made a motion to extend the reconsideration period for HB2561 for an additional 14 days. Passsed by v/v. |
2023-04-05 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Representative Kolodin made a motion to extend the reconsideration period for HB2561 for an additional 14 days. Passsed by v/v. |
2023-03-22 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Representative Kolodin made a motion to extend the reconsideration period for HB2561 for an additional 14 days. Passsed by s/v 31-29 |
2023-03-09 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2023-03-09 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (27-30-3-0) |
2023-03-09 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-03-07 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2023-03-07 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-07 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-1-0-0-0) |
2023-02-01 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-31 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Cities And Towns - Title 9
City Water Provider
Delayed Repeal
Emergency
Municipal Water Service
Requirements
Service
Water Service Outside City Or Town
City Water Provider
Delayed Repeal
Emergency
Municipal Water Service
Requirements
Service
Water Service Outside City Or Town
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 831 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 500.40 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |