AZ HB2566 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Universities; intellectual property
Title
Universities; intellectual property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-03-04 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-21-1-0) |
2013-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | House HEWD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-1-0-0) |
2013-02-12 | House | Referred to House HEWD Committee |
2013-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-11 | House | Assigned to House HEWD Committee |
2013-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |