AZ HB2584 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Residential building materials; requirements; prohibition
Title
Residential building materials; requirements; prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-13 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-11-1-0) |
2024-02-06 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-06 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-05 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-05 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-31 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Municipal Building Codes
Prohibition
Requirements
Residential Building Materials
Municipal Building Codes
Prohibition
Requirements
Residential Building Materials