AZ HB2585 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Controlled substances; marijuana; monitoring
Title
Controlled substances; marijuana; monitoring
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Ash [R] | Rep. Chad Campbell [D] | Rep. Matthew Heinz [D] | Rep. Russell Jones [R] |
Rep. Debbie McCune-Davis [D] | Rep. Eric Meyer [D] | Rep. Amanda Reeve [R] | Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-05 | Senate third reading , voting: (20-8-2-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Consent Calendar March 14, 2011 @ 1:10 PM | |
2011-03-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-07 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0) | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-03-07 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-02 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-02 | House third reading , voting: (51-6-3-0) | |
2011-02-23 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-09 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2011-02-08 | House read second time | |
2011-02-07 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Introduced in House and read first time |