AZ HB2599 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Chapter 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Chapter 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
AHCCCS; provider participation; exclusions
Title
AHCCCS; provider participation; exclusions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Chapter 302 | |
2016-05-17 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate FMFR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate FMFR Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FMFR Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-03-02 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0) |
2016-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-5-0-0-0) |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2016-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |