AZ HB2605 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Disposition of public roadways
Title
Disposition of public roadways
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Rivero [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-03 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 7204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 7208 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |