AZ HB2608 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Chapter 293
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Chapter 293
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; active registered voters
Title
Elections; active registered voters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Chapter 293 | |
2015-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2015-03-31 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-25 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-23-2-0) |
2015-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-16 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-1-0) |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to House ELECT Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |