AZ HB2654 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1536
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Illegal substances education; partnership
Title
Illegal substances education; partnership
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Motion HB 2654 substituted for SB 1536 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Motion HB 2654 substituted for SB 1536 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Chapter 326 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-03 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-7-1-0) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2654 substituted for SB 1536 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (40-20-0-0) |
2018-05-01 | House | House read second time |
2018-04-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1536 (Replaces) 2018-05-03 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Subjects
Department Of Health Services
Governor's Office Of Youth, Faith And Family
Illegal Substance Education
State Government - Title 41
Governor's Office Of Youth, Faith And Family
Illegal Substance Education
State Government - Title 41