AZ HB2656 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Women veteran special plate
Title
Women veteran special plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-06 | Senate third reading , voting: (24-4-2-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Consent Calendar March 21, 2011 @ 12:46 PM | |
2011-03-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-21 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-15 | Senate VMA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Senate VMA Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-10 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-10 | Assigned to Senate VMA Committee | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-09 | House third reading , voting: (49-10-1-0) | |
2011-03-07 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-23 | House Consent Calendar February 23, 2011 @ 3:31 PM with Objections | |
2011-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-17 | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-02-09 | House read second time | |
2011-02-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Assigned to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced in House and read first time |