AZ HB2699 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Endangered species programs; rescission; reimbursement
Title
Endangered species programs; rescission; reimbursement
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] |
Sen. Thomas Shope [R] | Sen. Albert Melvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Governor Vetoed | |
2014-04-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-17 | House | House final reading , voting: (36-21-3-0) |
2014-04-17 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-10 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-24-2-0) |
2014-03-10 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-1-0) |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | House FFR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to House FFR Committee |
2014-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House FFR Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |