AZ HB2721 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recovery school district
Title
Recovery school district
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-15 | House ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to House ED Committee | |
2010-02-10 | House read second time | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to House ED Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced in House and read first time |
Arizona State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=93&Bill_Number=HB2721 |
Text | http://www.azleg.gov/legtext/49leg/2r/bills/hb2721p.htm |