AZ HB2742 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Murder; domestic violence; inheritance
Title
Murder; domestic violence; inheritance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Governor Signed | |
2012-04-11 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-04 | House final reading , voting: (55-0-5-0) | |
2012-03-22 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-27 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-20 | Transmit to House | |
2012-03-20 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-15 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-02-28 | Senate read second time | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-02-24 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-02-23 | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-3-0) | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-21 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-21 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-20 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-07 | House ERA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-1-0-0) | |
2012-02-06 | Referred to House ERA Committee | |
2012-02-06 | House read second time | |
2012-02-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Assigned to House ERA Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced in House and read first time |