AZ HB2807 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Redistricting commission; open meeting law
Title
Redistricting commission; open meeting law
Sponsors
Rep. John Allen [R] | Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Rep. Cecil Ash [R] | Rep. Brenda Barton [R] |
Sen. Andy Biggs [R] | Rep. Heather Carter [R] | Sen. Chester Crandell [R] | Sen. Jeff Dial [R] |
Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Rep. Tom Forese [R] | Sen. Ron Gould [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Sen. Linda Gray [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] | Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Rep. Jack Harper [R] |
Rep. Peggy Judd [R] | Sen. John Kavanagh [R] | Sen. Lori Klein [R] | Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] |
Sen. Jerry Lewis [R] | Sen. Albert Melvin [R] | Sen. Javan Mesnard [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] |
Sen. Rick Murphy [R] | Rep. Justin Olson [R] | Rep. Justin Pierce [R] | Rep. Terri Proud [R] |
Rep. Carl Seel [R] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] | Sen. Steve Smith [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] |
Rep. Andy Tobin [R] | Sen. Michelle Ugenti-Rita [R] | Rep. Ted Vogt [R] | Rep. Victor Williams [R] |
Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Governor Signed | |
2012-03-27 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Transmit to House | |
2012-03-26 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-8-2-0) | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Senate GR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) | |
2012-03-06 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-02 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-01 | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-17-4-0) | |
2012-03-01 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-02-28 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-27 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-16 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2012-02-09 | House read second time | |
2012-02-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Introduced in House and read first time |