AZ HCR2020 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
First responders recognition day
Title
First responders recognition day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate third reading UNANIMOUSLY ADOPTED |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-02-25 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2013-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | House PSMRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to House PSMRA Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to House PSMRA Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |