AZ HCR2026 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-27 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-27 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
English language education; requirements
Title
English language education; requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-1-0-0) |
2019-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-18 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-11 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |