AZ HM2002 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress; ninth circuit reform
Title
Urging Congress; ninth circuit reform
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2016-05-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-23-6-0) |
2016-03-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-17 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-1-0) |
2016-03-15 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2016-03-15 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |