AZ SB1021 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Chapter 75
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Chapter 75
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Scope of practice; process; repeal
Title
Scope of practice; process; repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Chapter 75 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (40-13-6-0) |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-12 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-4-2-0) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Definitions
Health Professional Groups
Legislative Informational Hearings
Nonapplicability Of Chapter
Process
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Proposed Legislation
Regulation Of Health Professions
Repeal
Scope Of Practice
Written Report
Health Professional Groups
Legislative Informational Hearings
Nonapplicability Of Chapter
Process
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Proposed Legislation
Regulation Of Health Professions
Repeal
Scope Of Practice
Written Report
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 3101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3106 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |