AZ SB1042 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-24 - Referred to House HEALTH Committee
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-24 - Referred to House HEALTH Committee
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health professionals; specialty status claims
Title
Health professionals; specialty status claims
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |