AZ SB1073 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Chapter 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Chapter 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; adjudication; disposition; probation
Title
Juveniles; adjudication; disposition; probation
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 6 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2022-03-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-07 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-2-0-0) |
2022-02-24 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-01-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Adjudicated Delinquent
Adjudication
Appointment
Bailable Offenses
Child Safety - Title 8
Criminal Code - Title 13
Dangerous Offenders
Destruction Of Records
Disposition
Guardian Ad Litem
Intensive Probation
Juvenile Court (h)
Juvenile Detention Centers
Juvenile Probation Services Fund
Juvenile Proceedings
Juveniles
Probation
Release
Repeal
Right To Counsel
Adjudication
Appointment
Bailable Offenses
Child Safety - Title 8
Criminal Code - Title 13
Dangerous Offenders
Destruction Of Records
Disposition
Guardian Ad Litem
Intensive Probation
Juvenile Court (h)
Juvenile Detention Centers
Juvenile Probation Services Fund
Juvenile Proceedings
Juveniles
Probation
Release
Repeal
Right To Counsel
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 3967 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 246 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 322 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 349 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 350 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 352 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 353 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 354 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 355 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 356 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |