AZ SB1076 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-01 - Referred to House GOV Committee
Pending: House Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-01 - Referred to House GOV Committee
Pending: House Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Respiratory care; temporary licenses
Title
Respiratory care; temporary licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2012-03-01 | House HHS Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2012-02-14 | House read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2012-02-13 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2012-02-13 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-01-26 | Transmit to House | |
2012-01-26 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-01-24 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-24 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Senate HMLR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-0-0) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2012-01-12 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-11 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-11 | Assigned to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |