AZ SB1079 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - House third reading FAILED voting: (22-34-4-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - House third reading FAILED voting: (22-34-4-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Special plates; canyon; flying cross
Title
Special plates; canyon; flying cross
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (22-34-4-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-03-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-03-21 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2018-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-03-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-11-0-0) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-16-0-0) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-3-2-0) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2463 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2476 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1237 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |