AZ SB1092 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cotton research and protection council
Title
Cotton research and protection council
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Pierce [R] | Sen. Lynne Pancrazi [D] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] |
Rep. Gail Griffin [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Governor Signed | |
2013-04-30 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-04-03 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-1-0-0) |
2013-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | House AW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to House AW Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2013-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Assigned to House AW Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-2-2-0) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate NRRA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate NRRA Committee |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRRA Committee |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |