AZ SB1098 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona manufactured firearms; regulation.
Title
Arizona manufactured firearms; regulation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-03-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-22 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0) | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |