AZ SB1146 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - Senate motion to amend
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - Senate motion to amend
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Registration fees; VLT; gas tax
Title
Registration fees; VLT; gas tax
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Worsley [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Senator Montenegro to show the bill be retained (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Senator Montenegro to show the bill failed to pass (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Senator Montenegro to exclude the transit amendment as amended (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Senator Montenegro to exclude the Worsley flr amend (ref transit) (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Senator Montenegro to show the bill failed to pass (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Senator Montenegro to exclude the transit amendment as amended (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Senator Montenegro to exclude the Worsley flr amend (ref transit) (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate motion to amend |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate motion to amend |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate motion to amend |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate motion to amend |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate TRANSIT Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Highway Patrol Trust Fund
Disabled Parking
Funds
Gas Tax
Physical Disabilities
Reciprocity
Registration Fees
Repeal
State Government
Technical Correction
Transportation
Transportation Reinvestment Zones
Vlt
Disabled Parking
Funds
Gas Tax
Physical Disabilities
Reciprocity
Registration Fees
Repeal
State Government
Technical Correction
Transportation
Transportation Reinvestment Zones
Vlt