AZ SB1161 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Chapter 300
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Chapter 300
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Improvement districts; retention; detention basins
Title
Improvement districts; retention; detention basins
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Chapter 300 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (20-8-2-0) |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-04-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-1-1-0) |
2017-04-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-04-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2017-03-29 | House | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (13-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-27 | House | House JPS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-23 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Courthouse Security
Courthouse Security Fund
Courts And Civil Proceedings
Funds
Justice And Municipal Courts
Monies
Courthouse Security Fund
Courts And Civil Proceedings
Funds
Justice And Municipal Courts
Monies
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 116.08 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 284.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
22 | 281 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 574 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |