AZ SB1163 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Referred to House TI Committee
Pending: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Referred to House TI Committee
Pending: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicle repair facilities; towing
Title
Vehicle repair facilities; towing
Sponsors
Sen. Amanda Aguirre [D] | Sen. Jorge Garcia [D] | Rep. Albert Hale [D] | Rep. Russell Jones [R] |
Sen. Leah Landrum-Taylor [D] | Sen. Lynne Pancrazi [D] | Sen. Russell Pearce [R] | Rep. Stephen Pierce [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Referred to House TI Committee | |
2010-03-16 | House read second time | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House TI Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-03 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-03 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-7-1-0) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2010-02-08 | Senate Consent Calendar February 08, 2010 @ 1:48 PM with Objections | |
2010-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-08 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Senate CED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |