AZ SB1171 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cities; acquisition of wastewater utility
Title
Cities; acquisition of wastewater utility
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Rep. Peggy Judd [R] |
Sen. Albert Melvin [R] | Rep. Terri Proud [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] | Rep. Ted Vogt [R] |
Rep. Victor Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate Water, Land Use and Rural Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate Water, Land Use and Rural Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-12 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-11 | House third reading , voting: (36-23-1-0) | |
2011-04-07 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-03-21 | House Consent Calendar March 21, 2011 @ 3:30 PM with Objections | |
2011-03-22 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-22 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-21 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0) | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-02 | House GOV Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2011-03-03 | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to House TI Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House read second time | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to House TI Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-02-08 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-08 | Senate third reading , voting: (23-6-1-0) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Consent Calendar January 31, 2011 @ 2:15 PM with Objections | |
2011-02-01 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-01 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-31 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Senate WLRD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to Senate WLRD Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to Senate WLRD Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |