AZ SB1175 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vulnerable adult; duty
Title
Vulnerable adult; duty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-05 | Governor Signed | |
2013-04-03 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-25 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-03-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2013-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-03-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |