AZ SB1191 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Dental board; disciplinary actions; confidentiality
Title
Dental board; disciplinary actions; confidentiality
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2010-02-08 | Senate Consent Calendar February 08, 2010 @ 1:48 PM with Objections | |
2010-02-09 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-09 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-08 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Senate HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0) | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to Senate HEALTH Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to Senate HEALTH Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Arizona State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=93&Bill_Number=SB1191 |
Text | http://www.azleg.gov/legtext/49leg/2r/bills/sb1191p.htm |